(NEW MILLS) OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 March 1965: Standard registration
- 02 July 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 02 July 2009: Funds transferred to 1097655 NEW MILLS AND DISTRICT VOLUNTEER CENTRE
- SETT VALLEY HOUSE WELFARE COMMITTEE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.51k | £5.10k | £4.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.03k | £5.86k | £6.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 12 April 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 12 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 04 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH JANUARY 1965.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE GENERAL GOOD OF ALL OLD PEOPLE IN THE NEW MILLS DISTRICT BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION DEVELOPING PHYSCIAL IMPROVEMENT, FURTHER HEAL, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECT WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
NEW MILLS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window