Financial history THE ACCRINGTON DISTRICT SICK POOR FUND

Charity number: 222241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.86k £14.49k £22.06k £15.07k £15.14k
Total expenditure £11.22k £9.48k £13.51k £6.08k £11.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A