THE ACCRINGTON DISTRICT SICK POOR FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting persons in the area of benefice (wards of Hyndburn Borough Council, Lancashire) who are either a) both sick and poor. or b)in financial need. Preference will still be given to those living in the wards of Accrington, Clayton le Moors and Altham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 18 December 1963: Standard registration
- THE ACCRINGTON AND DISTRICT HELPING HANDS FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Roy Woodcock | Chair | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clegg | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Loraine Cox Mrs | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Rachel Wolstenholme | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Anderson | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUNE HARRISON | Trustee | 03 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ORMEROD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN BATTLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.86k | £14.49k | £22.06k | £15.07k | £15.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.22k | £9.48k | £13.51k | £6.08k | £11.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19 OCTOBER 1951 SCHEME AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09/09/2014
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SICK POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE BOROUGH OF ACCRINGTON, THE URBAN DISTRICT OF CLAYTON LE MOORS AND THE CIVIL PARISH OF ALTHAM IN ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT NAMELY (I) THE SUPPLY OF SPECIAL FOOD AND MEDICINES, MEDICAL COMFORTS, EXTRA BEDDING FUEL AND MEDICAL AND SURGICAL APPLIANCES; (II) THE PROVISION OF DOMESTIC HELP; (III) THE GRANT OF MONEY SO AS TO ENABLE THE RECIPIENTS TO OBTAIN SUCH BENEFITS AS AFORESAID OR TO DEFRAY THE EXPENSES OF CONVALESCENCE INCLUDING THE EXPENSE OF OBTAINING DOMESTIC HELP DURING CONVALESCENCE; (IV) THE PROVISION OF MOBILE PHYSIO-THERAPY SERVICES AND NECESSARY STAFF THEREFOR.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Grindleton Road
West Bradford
Clitheroe
BB7 4TE
- Phone:
- 01200422062
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window