Trustees THE ACCRINGTON DISTRICT SICK POOR FUND

Charity number: 222241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr David Roy Woodcock Chair 17 June 2015
None on record
Andrew Clegg Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Loraine Cox Mrs Trustee 07 November 2022
HYNDBURN LEISURE
Received: On time
Rachel Wolstenholme Trustee 07 February 2022
None on record
David Anderson Trustee 14 April 2016
None on record
JUNE HARRISON Trustee 03 June 2011
None on record
PATRICIA ORMEROD Trustee
None on record
JEAN BATTLE Trustee
None on record