WALTER HOLDNALL ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
There are no combined activities for our three dwellings, which are in our Village of Kinver - the residents vary in age from 47 to 79 and lead independent lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 28 February 1964: Standard registration
- THE CHARITY OF WALTER HOLDNALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Clarkson | Chair | 14 August 2020 |
|
|||||||
Keith Parsons | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Mark Ronald Middleton | Trustee | 07 August 2020 |
|
|||||||
Christine Allen | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Barbara Anne Rundle | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Thomas Cartwright | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
ENA DOREEN RAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.91k | £9.34k | £9.95k | £9.35k | £7.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.22k | £5.73k | £4.83k | £4.84k | £3.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14 NOVEMBER 1991.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR, AGED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM PERSONS.PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO PERSONS WHO ARE POOR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Compton Gardens
Kinver
STOURBRIDGE
DY7 6DS
- Phone:
- 01384872476
- Email:
- barbararundle@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window