THE ROYAL MUSICAL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 222410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity publishes the Journal of the Royal Musical Association half-yearly and annually the RMA Research Chronicle and RMA Monograph series. It organises and supports conferences concerning musicological matters and recognises the achievement of excellence in musical scholarship by the annual award of the Dent Medal, the Tippett Medal, the Jerome Roche Prize, and the Peter Le Huray Lecture.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £93,624
Total expenditure: £89,120

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 October 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • RMA (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Rebecca Louise Herissone-Kelly Trustee 01 January 2024
PURCELL SOCIETY TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Amelie Amy May Marie Blier-Carruthers Trustee 01 January 2024
FRIENDS OF DALLINGTON
Received: On time
Dr Erin Grace Johnson-Williams Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Dr Nicholas William James Attfield Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Professor Simon Patrick Keefe Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Dr Caroline Anne Bodman Rae Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Dr Laura Ann Hamer Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Dr Ann Renee van Allen-Russell Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Dr Susan Margaret Miller Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Dr Nuria Bonet Filella Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Dr Thomas Attah Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Professor Sarah Collins Trustee 01 January 2022
MUSIC AND LETTERS TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Genevieve Robyn Arkle Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Dr Mark Berry Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Professor Catherine Jane Tackley Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Dr Barbara Lucy Kelly Trustee 01 January 2021
THE FRIENDS OF UNIVERSITY ART AND MUSIC (LEEDS)
Received: On time
Dr Lois Fitch Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Valerie James Trustee 09 February 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £82.04k £88.62k £104.20k £186.10k £93.62k
Total expenditure £83.85k £75.24k £77.56k £89.30k £89.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
LETTER DATED 7 SEPTEMBER 1965.
Charitable objects
TO FINANCE AN ANNUAL MEDAL AWARDED TO A SCHOLAR OF ANY NATIONALITY FOR OUTSTANDING MUSICOLOGICAL WORK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 11 October 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
9 PATTERSON AVENUE
MANCHESTER
M21 9NB
Phone:
01618617542