POOR AND TOWN'S LAND (WIGGINTON)

Charity number: 222427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,040
Total expenditure: £1,121

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of York
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 December 1963: Standard registration
  • 19 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 04 October 2009: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 13 January 2012: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WIGGINTON PARISH COUNCIL CHARITY (Working name)
  • POOR'S LAND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Lakey Trustee 31 July 2024
None on record
Jane Roberts Trustee 27 June 2023
None on record
Christopher Edwards Trustee 06 September 2019
None on record
Richard Denton Mr Trustee 06 September 2019
None on record
Peter Vaughan Trustee 13 January 2012
VILLAGE HALL - WIGGINTON (KNOWN AS WIGGINTON 'OLD SCHOOL')
Charity reporting is overdue by 822 days
FRIENDS OF NEW EARSWICK SWIMMING POOL
Received: On time
WIGGINTON PARISH COUNCIL Trustee 22 June 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £765 £945 £970 £1.01k £1.04k
Total expenditure £0 £350 £35 £1.23k £1.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
PRINTED REPORTS VOLUME 8 PAGE 723
Charitable objects
PART OF THE INCOME TO BE DISTRIBUTED AT EASTER AMONGST POOR PERSONS OF THE PARISH OF WIGGINGTON THE REMAINDER FOR THE SUPPORT OF A BULL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WIGGINGTON
Registration history
  • 17 December 1963 : Standard registration
  • 19 August 2009 : Removed
  • 04 October 2009 : Standard registration
  • 09 September 2011 : Removed
  • 13 January 2012 : Re-registered

Contact information

Address:
The Old School
Mill Lane
Wigginton
York
North Yorkshire
YO32 2PU
Phone:
07724205786
Website:

No information available