VILLAGE HALL KNOWN AS 'VICTORY HALL' (LEA MARSTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity supports the management of an area of public land located on Birmingham Road, Lea Marston. The land exists for the enjoyment and leisure of parish residents and members of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 17 July 1963: Standard registration
- VICTORY HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Reilly | Chair | 10 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert Bryson | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lea Marston Parish Council | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 August 2024 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 May 2023 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2022 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 April 2021 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 14.4.54
Charitable objects
RECREATION HALL FOR GENERAL BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LEA MARSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 School Lane
Lea Marston
SUTTON COLDFIELD
West Midlands
B76 0BW
- Phone:
- 07770704617
- Email:
- LEAMARSTONPC@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
-
leamarstonpc.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window