ASSOCIATION FOR PROMOTING RETREATS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association promotes retreats by providing resources for people seeking a retreat, a retreat leader or venue. It supports retreat centres and those in retreat ministry and facilitates an occasional consultation for those identified as spirituality advisors in the Anglican Dioceses. It is a member organisation offering support to people of all denominations and none.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 October 1963: Standard registration
- A P R (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Urs Mattmann | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Ian Spencer | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dawn Harrison | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Cameron Butland | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
REV ALISON CHRISTIAN | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stewart McCredie | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Parker | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.19k | £24.46k | £34.27k | £18.43k | £31.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.37k | £27.10k | £46.37k | £47.26k | £37.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9/11/1987, AS AMENDED 17/10/1990, 6/11/1993, 11/1994, 24/10/2009 AND 17/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN LIFE THROUGH RETREATS, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF RETREATS WITHIN THE ANGLICAN CHURCHES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Linked charities
- 28 October 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 BROOKFIELD COTTAGES
THE STRAND
LYMPSTONE
EXMOUTH
EX8 5ES
- Phone:
- 01395272243
- Email:
- promoting.retreats@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window