Accounts and annual returns BOARD OF GUARDIANS FOR THE RELIEF OF THE JEWISH POOR OF LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 222465
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 20 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 20 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 15 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 17 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 17 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 28 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 15 December 2005 On Time