Financial history BOARD OF GUARDIANS FOR THE RELIEF OF THE JEWISH POOR OF LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 222465
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £291.57k £372.40k £430.14k £311.49k £349.68k
Total expenditure £295.93k £295.70k £312.23k £309.73k £295.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A