ST ALBANS OLD PEOPLE'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide assistance to elderly people in need in the area of City and District of St Albans, Hertfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 04 October 1963: Standard registration
- THE ST ALBANS OLD PEOPLE'S VOLUNTARY HOME (Previous name)
- THE ST ALBANS OLD PEOPLE'S VOLUNTARY HOMES TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Rolfe | Chair | 10 May 2021 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS FRANK HILL | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robert Johnson | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHONA LOUISE HYDE | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ARINRHOD PAZZI-AXWORTHY | Trustee | 21 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.62k | £181.69k | £151.37k | £202.73k | £195.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.29k | £255.36k | £335.38k | £332.04k | £287.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 30 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 MAY 2015 as amended on 01 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OVER THE AGE OF 60 YEARS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (2) INSOFAR AS THE CHARITY'S ASSETS CANNOT BE APPLIED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT THEY CAN BE APPLIED IN THE CITY AND DISTRICT OF ST ALBANS. (3) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. (4) IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO ASSIST SOMEONE (WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED) WHO IS: (A) RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT; OR (B) ONLY TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
CITY OF ST ALBANS
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Sandringham Road
Flitwick
BEDFORD
MK45 1RW
- Phone:
- 07738580619
- Email:
- secretary@staopt.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window