THE CHARTERED CERTIFIED ACCOUNTANTS' BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Chartered Certified Accountants' Benevolent Fund provides support to ACCA members and their dependants who are experiencing severe financial difficulties. The support given to beneficiaries ranges from one off payments to longer term support or a loan. ACCA operates in over 170 countries, and the Benevolent Fund's support is available to members worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 February 1964: Standard registration
- CCABF (Working name)
- THE CERTIFIED ACCOUNTANTS' BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Andrew Lloyd-Davies | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Pui Ying Tang | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Anthony Gordon Thorne | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|||||
ANDREW OVERS DOWSETT | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
ADRIEN ERIC PIERRE LAURE | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.63k | £263 | £449 | £763 | £1.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63k | £263 | £449 | £763 | £1.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND REGULATIONS ADOPTED ON THE 8TH SEPTEMBER 1947 AS AMENDED ON THE 26TH APRIL 1949, THE 30TH APRIL 1963, THE 25TH APRIL 1972 AND THE 28TH APRIL 1976 AND 9TH MAY 2002 AS AMENDED 18 MAY 2006 AND 17 MAY 2007 AND 15 MAY 2008 AND 21 MAY 2009. AS AMENDED ON 15 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
ASSISTANCE FOR NECESSITOUS MEMBRS OF THE ASSOCIATION OF CERTIFIED ACCOUNTANTS OR THEIR DEPENDANTS. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE RULE 2 OF RULES AND REGULATIONS).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CCABF
C/O ACCA
110 QUEEN STREET
GLASGOW
G1 3BX
- Phone:
- 01415344045
- Email:
- hugh.mccash@accaglobal.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window