THE PATHFINDER FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religous education for young people according to the teaching and practice of the Church of England by means of prayer groups, lectures, discussions, meditations, and retreats, in the context of a Christian community life, which is ecumenical and international and providing regular celebrations of the Holy Eucharist.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 13 August 1963: Standard registration
- BICKERSTETH HOUSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trisha Marie Rassatt | Chair | 28 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP THEODORE BEDFORD SMITH | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Emma Ruth Dinwiddy-Smith | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev PHILIPPA ANNE TURNER | Trustee | 28 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Ilona Pimbert | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL JAMES MORGAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.30k | £56.41k | £62.60k | £94.20k | £146.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.48k | £62.81k | £61.76k | £92.99k | £101.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 12TH JANUARY 1944 AS AMENDED 20TH JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRACTICE AND THE STUDY OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PRIMARILY DIRECTED TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WITH EMPHASIS ON ITS CATHOLIC TRADITION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 SHEFFIELD TERRACE
LONDON
W8 7NQ
- Phone:
- 02077275586
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window