Financial history MORECAMBE AND LANCASTER MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 222647
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £83.39k £22.05k £40.86k £44.69k £51.78k
Total expenditure £33.76k £36.04k £42.84k £40.66k £57.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A £3.79k N/A