THE 29TH COUNTY OF LANCASTER (BURNLEY) BATTALION HOME GUARD WELFARE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It benefits persons and dependants (who may be in need) who have served in the former 29th (Burnley) Home Guard. This particular Home Guard were the men who served in the coal mines of Lancashire during the last war.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lancashire
Governance
- 30 July 1965: Standard registration
- 21 August 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 29TH BURNLEY HOME GUARD WELFARE FUND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38 | £36 | £28 | £19 | |
|
Total expenditure | £450 | £450 | £450 | £450 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 12 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 27 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 07 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 15 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 23 FEBRUARY 1968 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 6 FEBRUARY 1969 AND 3 DECEMBER 1979.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT IN CASES OF NEED OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE FORMER 29TH COUNTY OF LANCASTER (BURNLEY) BATTALION HOME GUARD OR THE WIVES, WIDOWS OR DEPENDENTS OF SUCH PERSONS. ANY INCOME NOT SO REQUIRED TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BNEFIT OF ALL RANKS OF ANY UNIT OR SUB-UNIT OF THE 4TH (VOLUNTEER) BATTALION THE QUEENS LANCASHIRE REGIMENT FOR THE TIME BEING STATIONED IN BURNLEY IN ANY MANNE WHICH WILL INCREASE THE EFFICIENCY OF SAME.
Area of benefit
BURNLEY AND NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window