ROBINSON'S RETREAT AND RELIEF CHARITIES

Charity number: 222700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RELIEVING NEED FOR MINISTERS (ACTIVE OR RETIRED) OF CONGREGATIONAL AND BAPTIST CHURCHES AND OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND FOR WIDOWS OF SUCH MINISTERS RESIDENT IN ENGLAND. THE TRUSTEES APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF BENEFICIARIES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024

Total income: £110,654
Total expenditure: £121,576

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SAMUEL ROBINSON CHARITIES (Working name)
  • SAMUEL ROBINSONS CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TONY ALDERMAN Trustee
THE VALENTINE POOLE CHARITY
Received: On time
SARAH RACHAEL TITFORD'S CHARITY
Received: On time
DAVID PORTER Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH ANN LAWSON QC MA Trustee
None on record
HOWARD ROGER BROWN Trustee
None on record
ROGER FREDERICK HUGHES CA Trustee
None on record
LYN DYER HOPKINS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £74.48k £94.91k £100.37k £104.32k £110.65k
Total expenditure £102.11k £98.79k £118.27k £126.94k £121.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2024 23 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2023 29 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 29 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 12 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 28 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 28 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 26 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 6 NOVEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
PAYMENT OF PENSIONS AND RELIEF IN NEED FOR:- PRESENT OR FORMER PASTORS OR MINISTERS OF THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH, CONGREGATIONAL OR INDEPENDENT CHURCHES OR BAPTIST CHURCHES WHO ARE RESIDENT IN ENGLAND OR WALES AND ARE MARRIED OR WIDOWED WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS OF THE AFORESAID WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE BRITISH ISLES AND HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF SUCH CHURCHES FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 14 January 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
BOCKETTS
DOWNS ROAD
EPSOM
KT18 5HA
Phone:
01372 727777
Website:

No information available