WOODILL AND ROBINSON'S CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we do not do any fund raising we distribute income from legacies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 17 March 1964: Standard registration
- 28 June 2022: Funds received from 235874-1 JANE BELWOOD
- 28 June 2022: Funds received from 235874-2 MICHAEL HILL
- 28 June 2022: Funds received from 235874-3 CUTHBERT HODGSON
- 28 June 2022: Funds received from 235874-4 JOHN HUDSON
- 28 June 2022: Funds received from 235874-5 WILLIAM MARSHALL
- 01 August 2024: Funds received from 235874 CHARITIES OF BELWOOD AND OTHERS
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY NOEL BARRETT | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
joseph alan JEFFERSON | Trustee | 01 November 1993 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE JAMES BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £236 | £239 | £241 | £241 | £220 | |
|
Total expenditure | £87 | £87 | £88 | £87 | £88 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
1)SCHEME OF 15 MAY 1885 2)REPORT VOL.7 PG 723.
Charitable objects
1) ONE HALF OF THE INCOME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF LOFTUS AND THE OTHER HALF FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE TOWNSHIP OF UGTHORPE(CHARITY OF THOMAS WOODILL).2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF LOFTUS(CHARITY OF RALPH ROBINSON).
Area of benefit
LOFTUS (FORMERLY LOFTHOUSE),UGTHORPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Ellerby Lane
Runswick
SALTBURN-BY-THE-SEA
TS13 5HS
- Phone:
- 01947840692
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window