JOHN CASTLEHOW TOPPIN MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hall is used for community functions, operating as a community hub with use by: Skelton village school, local youth, adult and senior groups, meetings, classes etc, as well as a polling station. Its activities include keep fit, theatre, dances, school, church and social gatherings and suppers and is available for private hire for social events. Open to all ages, abilities and ethnicities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £30,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 15 July 1963: Standard registration
- Skelton Toppin Memorial Hall (Working name)
- THE SKELTON MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- THE JOHN CASTLEHOW TOPPIN MEMORIAL HALL (KNOWN AS "THE SKELTON MEMORIAL HALL" ) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT TOWERS | Chair | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Steven Kevin O'Keeffe | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Beaty Johnston | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
John William Potter | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ALAN PROVONCHA | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE SEALBY | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM PEARSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.99k | £70.90k | £16.59k | £39.78k | £146.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.40k | £12.99k | £15.38k | £84.35k | £94.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £60.00k | £9.67k | £2.67k | £30.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 11TH SEPTEMBER, 1924
Charitable objects
A HALL OR READING ROOM AND LIBRARY FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF ALL PERSONS IN SKELTON AND DISTRICT
Area of benefit
SKELTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Bob Provoncha
Pinecroft
Skelton
Penrith
CA11 9SE
- Phone:
- 017684 84245
- Email:
- bobprovoncha@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window