BRADBURY FIELDS SERVICES FOR BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer assessment and rehabilitation services to blind and partially sighted people accross Liverpool, Knowsley and Sefton. Hold the register of blind and partially sighted people on behalf of the local authority. Offer a training and transcription service to outside agencies. Offer health and social activities to service users.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 30 September 1963: Standard registration
- LVSB (Working name)
- LIVERPOOL VOLUNTARY SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
- LIVERPOOL VOLUNTARY SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND (INCORPORATED) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Lee | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Angela O'Brien | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Cole FCA | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Hughes-Paton | Trustee | 23 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Ditchfield | Trustee | 26 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
William Tudor Mansel ROBERTS | Trustee | 02 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROGER PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GERALDINE BOUNDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN JANET TURNHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £943.44k | £1.02m | £1.57m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £919.35k | £1.10m | £1.33m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £530.57k | £637.93k | £884.49k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £193.62k | £142.71k | £425.33k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £63.65k | £76.43k | £9.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £680.08k | £792.83k | £1.14m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.09k | £1.07k | £1.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £5.00k | £5.07k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £2.52k | £4.73k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £806.34k | £982.16k | £1.23m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £113.01k | £115.03k | £103.53k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.43k | £15.22k | £30.12k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £107.43k | £103.38k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 August 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION, INCORPORATED 31 MARCH, 1960 AMENDED 16 JANUARY 1970, 18 NOVEMBER 1996 AND 16 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26/9/2007
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE MERSEYSIDE AREA OR SUCH OTHER AREA AS THE BOARD SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WHO MAY HAVE DIFFICULTIES CAUSED THROUGH BLINDNESS OR PARTIAL SIGHT BY (IF NECESSARY) ASSESSING THE NEEDS OF SUCH INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS AND THEREAFTER (WHERE RESOURCES PERMIT) PROVIDING REHABILITATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING, SUPPORT SERVICES, ADVICE, SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT, SOCIAL ACTIVITIES, HOLIDAYS OR SUCH OTHER SERVICES OR EQUIPMENT AS SHALL ASSIST IN ATTAINING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE AREA OR SUCH OTHER AREA AS THE BOARD SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BRADBURYCENTRE
YOUENS WAY
LIVERPOOL
MERSEYSIDE
L14 2EP
- Phone:
- 01512210888
- Email:
- info@bradburyfields.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window