Linked charities ROBERT BOLLAND

Charity number: 222862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 26 JULY 1861, 13 MARCH 1896 AND 11 APRIL 1963 AS AMENDED ON 20 FEBRUARY 1997 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2)(D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE DESERVING POOR RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF EMBSAY-WITH-EASTBY
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EMBSAY-WITH-EASTBY
Registration history
  • 10 March 1964 : Standard registration