Charity overview FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER
Charity number: 1195675-1
Linked charity
Governing document
FOUNDED UNDER ROYAL PATRONAGE IN 1927 SEE COPY APPEAL DATED 1928, AS ALTERED BY CONSTITUTION OF 17 JANUARY 1976, REVISED BY CONSTITUTIONS OF 22 JULY 1981, 21 MAY 1990, 29 JUNE 1991 AND 12 DECEMBER 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION BY ASSISTING IN THE SUPPORT OF THE CATHEDRAL AND METROPOLITICAL CHURCH OF ST PETER IN YORK (THE MINSTER)BY CONTRIBUTING BOTH FINANCIALLY AND IN OTHER APPROPRIATE WAYS TO ITS PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, BEAUTIFICATION AND MINISTRY.
Area of benefit
YORK.
Registration history
- 08 February 1966: Standard registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.