ST JUDE'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the trust is for general charitable purposes, in particular, to help the disabled and disadvantaged either directly to individuals or via charitable organisations. Applications should be made by post only (no e-mails) by April and October for review in May and November. All applications are considered but in the interest of costs, only successful applicants will receive a response.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 February 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER MILLMAN | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM GEORGE DUCKETT | Trustee | 24 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY K DUCKETT | Trustee | 01 October 1981 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.47k | £40.51k | £48.07k | £54.88k | £46.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.63k | £63.18k | £57.35k | £57.46k | £59.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEEDS DATED 27TH FEBRUARY 1961 AND 22ND JUNE 1965 as amended on 29 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
(A) RELIEF OF POVERTY; (B) ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION; (C) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; (D) OTHER VALID CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DRUCES LLP
SALISBURY HOUSE
LONDON WALL
LONDON
EC2M 5PS
- Phone:
- 02076389271
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window