Financial history THE LODGE OF LOYAL SERVICE (NO 5890) BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 222899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £746 £255 £767 £722 £1.17k
Total expenditure £800 £150 £800 £800 £1.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A