THE LODGE OF LOYAL SERVICE (NO 5890) BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raises money via collections within the Lodge and by social events. Provides financial support for other Charities and for local groups. Will provide physical support to local groups/charities if practical and upon request
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Howard James | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Scott Smith | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROGER JAMES HARRISON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £746 | £255 | £767 | £722 | £1.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £800 | £150 | £800 | £800 | £1.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 5TH JANUARY 1945
Charitable objects
1) MAKING DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS OR LOANS TO THE MASONIC CHARITIES. 2) PROVIDING FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND FURTHERANCE OF THE INTERESTS OF THE CHARITIES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST ACRE
UPPER HALL CLOSE
IPSLEY
REDDITCH
WORCESTERSHIRE
B98 0AL
- Phone:
- 01527524195
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window