Financial history THE DUCHESS OF YORK HOSPITAL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 222924
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009
Total gross income £2.93k £2.87k £2.82k £2.29k £0
Total expenditure £4.20k £4.20k £4.00k £3.51k £16.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A