THE INSKIP LEAGUE OF FRIENDSHIP FOR DISABLED PERSONS BACUP AND DISTRICT BRANCH NO 9
Charity number: 222929
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Total income: £255
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
- Lancashire
Governance
Registration history:
- 03 April 1964: Standard registration
- 18 June 2007: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 18 June 2007: Funds transferred to 224270 ACCRINGTON AND DISTRICT INSKIP LEAGUE OF FRIENDSHI...
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.67k | £1.30k | £255 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.52k | £1.05k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 14 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 25 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 20 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22ND JUNE 1954
Charitable objects
THE ASSISTANCE AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF CRIPPLED AND DISABLED PERSONS TOWARDS THE ENJOYMENT OF A FULLER AND HAPPIER LIFE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BOROUGH OF BACUP AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window