THE SARAH AND CHRISTOPHER SMITHSON MEMORIAL HOMES

Charity Number: 222977
Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of accommodation for elderly single women. The Parish of Heckmondwike.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £11,113
Total expenditure: £15,221

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kirklees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 February 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Melvyn Bathgate Trustee 13 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, HECKMONDWIKE WITH ALL SOULS, NORRISTHORPE
Received: 91 days late
Geraldine Thompson Trustee 13 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, HECKMONDWIKE WITH ALL SOULS, NORRISTHORPE
Received: 91 days late
Rev KAREN YOUNG Trustee 06 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.48k £10.90k £10.98k £11.96k £11.11k
Total expenditure £12.09k £3.74k £6.32k £10.19k £15.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 April 2021 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILLS PROVED IN P.R. ON 30 SEPTEMBER 1929 AND 13 MARCH 1935.
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR WIDOWS OR SPINSTERS OF GOOD CHARACTER AND REPUTATION WHO SHALL HAVE BEEN BORN IN THE PARISH OF TOWNSHIP OF HECKMONDWIKE OR WHO SHALL AT THE TIME OF NOMINATION HAVE BEEN FOR NOT LESS THAN 10 YEARS PREVIUOSLY AND SHALL THEN BE AN INHABITANT OF THE SAID TOWNSHIP OR PARISH
Area of benefit
HECKMONDWIKE
Registration history
  • 20 February 1968 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
25 CHURCH STREET
HECKMONDWIKE
WEST YORKSHIRE
WF16 0AX
Phone:
01924405881
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available