Financial history MENAI BRIDGE WAR MEMORIAL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 223012
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £20.82k £24.27k £52.11k £26.17k £43.16k
Total expenditure £22.54k £16.53k £17.68k £32.69k £35.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.02k £11.14k £11.54k £8.00k £13.21k