Trustees MENAI BRIDGE WAR MEMORIAL COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 223012

Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin John Wood | Chair | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Bronwen Banner | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Gethyn Bickerton | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Beverly Ann Humphries-Jones | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Denise Elizabeth Owen | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth Kenyon Moyle | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Alison wood | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Ella Susan Fisk | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Councillor SELWYN Trefor WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.