KYTES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of persons suffering from paraplegia, any form of paralysis or other disability. Preference shall be given to persons suffering from these conditions who are ex-servicemen or women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 August 1967: Standard registration
- "KYTES" (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN WINGATE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christopher Sharwood-Smith | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Victoria Cox | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Deborah Taverner | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICOLE STOUT | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
TRICIA SMITH | Trustee | 24 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR TIM O'BRIEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.43k | £69.32k | £67.82k | £74.83k | £74.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.97k | £76.02k | £71.96k | £104.63k | £144.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 24 APRIL 1948 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 14 JANUARY 2003, SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 29 AUGUST 2008 AND SECTION 75A RESOLUTION DATED 27 APRIL 2009.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PARAPLEGIA, ANY FORM OF PARALYSIS OR OTHER DISABILITY. PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY OF THOSE CONDITIONS WHO ARE EX-SERVICEMEN OR WOMEN. ONLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN, OR BEING TREATED IN, GREAT BRITAIN OR NORTHERN IRELAND SHALL BE ELIGIBLE TO BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 735
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN9 9WP
- Phone:
- 07766 705176
- Email:
- kytestrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window