THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE FOR THE OLD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide Village Hall facilities for the village of Rougham in Norfolk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 13 August 1964: Standard registration
- ROUGHAM VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- ROUGHAM VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE (Working name)
- THE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SALLY NORTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Carol ONeil | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Robertson | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SALLY SAMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.20k | £623 | £1.31k | £988 | £363 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.94k | £698 | £964 | £1.25k | £1.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £128 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MINUTES OF MEETING HELD IN 1945.
Charitable objects
MAINTAINING PREMISES IN THE VILLAGE FOR THE HOLDING OF FUNCTIONS FOR LOCAL ORGANISATIONS. I.E. HOSPITAL, BRITISH LEGION, OLD PEOPLES CLUB, CRICKET CLUB, FOOTBALL CLUB, BOWLS CLUB, CHURCH CHAPEL, ST. DUNSTANS, PARISH COUNCIL & ETC.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF ROUGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seymoregate
Rougham
King's Lynn
PE32 2SF
- Phone:
- 01328838682
- Email:
- Fionatigereyes@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window