Accounts and annual returns HAXBY UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 223165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 November 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2024 Not Required
Annual return 20 November 2023 30 January 2025 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 20 November 2022 16 November 2023 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 20 November 2021 14 November 2022 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 20 November 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 November 2020 Not Required