Trustees DERBY TOC H CHILDREN'S CAMP
Charity number: 223219

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FIONA WALPOLE-BOURNE | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick Meynell | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
EMMA BAKER | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karam Singh | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dena Delahay | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Gration | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Antony Lovell | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT KIRKMAN | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary-Jade Harris | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
D'Mya Sandar | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HENNAN | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SAM REEVES | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham Harper | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
NATALIE SANDAR | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
TONY SANDAR MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.