Trustees KIRTON CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 223230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul James Norwood Father Trustee 08 February 2025
THE SPEAK COTTAGE HOMES CHARITY
Received: On time
Timothy Gerrard Jessop Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Keith Motley Trustee 25 September 2021
THE SPEAK COTTAGE HOMES CHARITY
Received: On time
Sophie Chapman Trustee 25 September 2021
THE SPEAK COTTAGE HOMES CHARITY
Received: On time
Colin Thomas Smith Trustee 22 May 2021
THE SPEAK COTTAGE HOMES CHARITY
Received: On time
Lawrence Chapman Trustee 16 February 2013
THE SPEAK COTTAGE HOMES CHARITY
Received: On time