Financial history ARNOLD DISTRICT OLD PEOPLES WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 223260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £22.24k £2.29k £17.50k £19.73k £21.87k
Total expenditure £14.78k £9.52k £12.03k £13.13k £12.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A