Financial history R HANBURY TENISON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 223310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.72k £14.57k £21.10k £19.68k £539.17k
Total expenditure £15.43k £15.77k £23.37k £20.62k £19.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £533.49k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.85k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.83k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £518.49k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.94k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £787
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0