CENTRAL BIBLE HAMMOND TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Printing, publishing and selling books, periodicals, calendars and other publications designed to propagate the Protestant and Evangelical tenets of the Christian faith which are in line with the interpretation put forward by such early writers of the 'Brethren' movement as J.N.Darby and W.Kelly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Argentina
- Australia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- China
- Czech Republic
- France
- Germany
- Ghana
- Hong Kong
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Mexico
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- Scotland
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 09 October 1963: Standard registration
- SCRIPTURE TRUTH (Working name)
- SCRIPTURE TRUTH PUBLICATIONS (Working name)
- STP (Working name)
- CENTRAL BIBLE TRUTH DEPOT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GORDON DAVID KELL | Chair | 02 August 1995 |
|
|||||
RUTH OLLERHEAD | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Brian Donaldson | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HEY BROADLEY | Trustee | 11 February 2005 |
|
|
||||
PETER EDWARD OLLERHEAD | Trustee | 31 January 2003 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.69k | £80.43k | £36.39k | £37.54k | £154.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.95k | £44.80k | £50.62k | £73.48k | £56.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 NOVEMBER 1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 DECEMBER 1970, 13 OCTOBER 2009 AND 29 JANUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION BY PRINTING PUBLISHING AND SELLING ALL CLASSES OF BOOKS, NEWSPAPERS, PERIODICALS, MAGAZINES, CALENDARS, MAPS AND OTHER PUBLICATIONS DESIGNED TO MAKE KNOWN AND PROPAGATE THE PROTESTANT AND EVANGELICAL TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 2. TO ADVANCE THE PROTESTANT AND EVANGELICAL TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING THROUGH PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE DOCTRINAL AND PRACTICAL ASPECTS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN LINE WITH THE INTERPRETATION PUT FORWARD BY SUCH EARLY WRITERS OF THE "BRETHREN" MOVEMENT AS J N DARBY AND W KELLY, TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 3. THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ENTIRELY CONSISTENT WITH OBJECTS 1 AND 2 ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
UK AND WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
31-33 Glover Street
CREWE
CW1 3LD
- Phone:
- 01270252274
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window