PONTEFRACT AND ACKWORTH ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of almshouse accommodation for needy local people of pensionable age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 02 August 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ROCKETT | Chair |
|
||||||
DAVID DOUGLAS HENSHAW JONES | Trustee | 17 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Eric Alexander Jackson JP | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAT WARING | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY COOK | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RICHARD RAMSKILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DEREK VAUX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER SIDDONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.07k | £133.13k | £119.28k | £83.71k | £86.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.42k | £123.97k | £65.30k | £260.64k | £89.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 06 NOV 1978 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 07 MAY 1986 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 05 JUL 2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES. ANNUAL PAYMENTS TO THE VICAR OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GILES, PONTEFRACT. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE.
Area of benefit
PONTEFRACT AND ACKWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Meeting Room
2a Ryder Close
Halfpenny Lane
Pontefract
West Yorkshire
WF8 4BS
- Phone:
- 01977700297
- Email:
- aralmshouse@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.