THE CARTER INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 31 July 1963: Standard registration
- FILKINS VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD MARTIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NOELLE WALSH | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE CARE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS DIANE BLACKETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.30k | £16.65k | £24.27k | £10.10k | £7.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.05k | £9.44k | £14.90k | £7.07k | £17.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.68k | £3.42k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 March 2022 | 220 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 05 October 2020 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 2ND JULY 1982 AND VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 10 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF FILKINS AND BROUGHTON POGGS AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD. (SEE SCHEME FOR FULL DETAILS).
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tallet Cottage
Filkins
LECHLADE
Gloucestershire
GL7 3JJ
- Phone:
- 07713636415
- Email:
- richard@naturalbest.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window