Financial history KENT ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 223382
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £121.40k £99.19k £99.86k £99.65k £93.76k
Total expenditure £103.52k £94.39k £123.54k £157.96k £195.81k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A