THE PALMER HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The administration and management of 'The Palmer Hall' Fairford available to various user groups and individual hiring, a community facility for the town of Fairford, Glos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 19 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scott MacEwen Dykes | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Kate Marjorie Matthews | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hender Corredor-Escalante | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Duncan Lang | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Dawn Stephenson | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Morris | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Winifred Moulden | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephanie North | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Lorraine Jean Lawrence | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Hatton | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hatton | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUE CROWLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.94k | £15.05k | £6.99k | £10.99k | £10.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.64k | £11.64k | £9.08k | £10.93k | £11.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £348 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 April 2024 | 448 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11TH MARCH 1985
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF FAIRFORD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SIAD INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE TOWN OF FAIRFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 PARK CLOSE
FAIRFORD
GL7 4LF
- Phone:
- 07929569071
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window