Financial history WEST DERBY WASTE LANDS CHARITY

Charity number: 223623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £52.39k £70.81k £70.22k £74.58k £81.08k
Total expenditure £62.92k £82.97k £103.39k £88.85k £82.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A