Financial history THE LIVERPOOL DISTRICT MISSIONARY TRUSTEE COMPANY (INCORPORATED)

Charity number: 223627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £2.98k £3.61k £3.61k £3.12k £3.20k
Total expenditure £2.82k £3.69k £3.69k £3.06k £3.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A