BIRMINGHAM REPERTORY THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 223660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Birmingham Repertory Theatre is a producing theatre based in Birmingham, UK.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Croatia
  • Germany
  • Italy
  • Japan
  • Netherlands
  • Poland
  • Scotland
  • South Korea
  • Spain

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 1963: Standard registration
  • 09 January 2023: Funds received from 1090248 THE JOYCE FARLEY EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE BIRMINGHAM REP (Working name)
  • THE REP (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andy Street CBE Chair 01 November 2024
None on record
Natasha Harris Trustee 09 December 2024
None on record
Tracey Orr Trustee 09 December 2024
None on record
Mark Smith Trustee 09 December 2024
None on record
John Hornby Trustee 17 June 2024
None on record
Councillor Jayne Francis Trustee 13 September 2021
THE WEST MIDLANDS ARTS TRUST LTD
Received: On time
Victoria Fiona Marsom Trustee 12 July 2021
None on record
Atif Ali Trustee 12 July 2021
None on record
RACHEL ROUSSEL-TYSON Trustee 12 July 2021
None on record
Adrian Anthony Lester Trustee 04 March 2020
None on record
Ayub Khan MBE Trustee 24 February 2020
ENGLISH FOLK DANCE AND SONG SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE SHAKESPEARE BIRTHPLACE TRUST
Received: On time
Libraries Connected
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.31m £6.36m £12.59m £14.28m £15.36m
Total expenditure £11.39m £4.43m £10.13m £14.73m £15.80m
Income from government contracts N/A £241.45k £227.40k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.99m £4.95m £5.09m £2.03m £2.07m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.76m £5.32m £6.07m £2.64m £2.45m
Income - Other trading activities £2.79m £724.00k £1.60m £3.67m £2.91m
Income - Charitable activities £4.71m £293.00k £4.83m £7.88m £9.96m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £54.00k £26.00k £95.00k £80.00k £50.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £8.00k £0 £0 £0 £30.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.16m £3.71m £8.71m £11.41m £13.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.24m £727.00k £1.40m £3.32m £2.53m
Expenditure - Governance £3.00k £0 £1.00k £3.00k £179.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £5.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £20.00k £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £1.35m £1.38m £3.45m £3.41m £3.26m
Long-term investments £526.00k £967.00k £890.00k £829.00k £933.00k
Other assets £1.93m £2.87m £4.41m £5.73m £6.29m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.74m £2.09m £3.16m £4.83m £5.70m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Birmingham Repertory Theatre
6 Centenary Square
BIRMINGHAM
B1 2EP
Phone:
01212452000