Financial history CHARITY OF THOMAS ROBINSON FERENS FOR A HOME OF REST AT HOLDERNESS HOUSE

Charity number: 223669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £971.50k £874.69k £1.08m £1.09m £1.06m
Total expenditure £943.50k £950.53k £1.08m £1.23m £1.26m
Income from government contracts £271.90k £177.71k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £61.18k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £865.46k £788.48k £991.96k £998.77k £950.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £106.05k £86.21k £86.22k £89.75k £106.95k
Income - Other £0 £0 £2.20k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £929.38k £936.22k £1.07m £1.22m £1.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.12k £14.31k £16.39k £15.32k £15.74k
Expenditure - Governance £22.97k £0 £23.59k £25.61k £57.81k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £14.12k £14.31k £16.39k £15.32k £15.74k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0