Governing document CHARITY OF THOMAS ROBINSON FERENS FOR A HOME OF REST AT HOLDERNESS HOUSE
Charity number: 223669

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 1.8.1930 SCHEME OF 3/12/1957 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 18TH JULY 2003 as amended on 18 Mar 2021 as amended on 02 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE OF A REST HOME FOR GENTLEWOMEN IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CITY AND COUNTY OF KINGSTON-UPON-HULL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.