RSPCA COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 223678
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Where possible the Branch will provide sanctuary, rehabilitation and rehoming to animals in need. The Trustees are committed to tackling the over population of domestic animals through a scheme of community animal action events, education and the availability of a low cost preventative veterinary treatment clinic.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 November 1963: Standard registration
  • 09 May 2011: Funds received from 232235 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANI...
  • 19 December 2018: Funds received from 225860 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANI...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • COVENTRY ANIMAL CENTRE (Working name)
  • COVENTRY RSPCA (Working name)
  • RSPCA COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
  • ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
  • RSPCA - COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
  • THE RSPCA COVENTRY, NUNEATON & DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sam Carolan Trustee 03 September 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Alexander Tarr Trustee 04 June 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Cara Finn Trustee 01 March 2024
None on record
Kate Louise Measures Trustee 07 February 2023
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Hilary Janet Farndon Trustee 16 January 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Glenn Andrew Fleet Trustee 14 September 2016
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Michelle Ann Canciani Trustee 16 August 2016
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Susan Margaret Hucks Trustee 13 July 2016
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
CATHERINE Diane KAVANAGH Trustee
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS COVENTRY AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £629.25k £755.25k £917.03k £797.80k £987.62k
Total expenditure £573.93k £561.23k £677.15k £755.71k £841.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £221.01k £317.62k £305.40k £194.92k £275.23k
Income - Other trading activities £286.98k £272.47k £453.61k £486.86k £572.54k
Income - Charitable activities £112.49k £116.21k £102.41k £101.77k £123.59k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.57k £10.18k £6.78k £8.45k £12.57k
Income - Other £7.20k £38.76k £48.84k £5.80k £3.69k
Income - Legacies £92.33k £130.96k £160.98k £58.53k £122.40k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £369.52k £370.87k £428.88k £492.56k £540.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £191.18k £180.72k £236.97k £247.37k £284.71k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £16.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £13.23k £9.64k £11.31k £15.79k £16.58k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £560.55k £664.24k £649.40k £925.24k £881.20k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £942.96k £1.02m £1.29m £1.06m £1.25m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £23.35k £13.63k £23.96k £24.26k £27.02k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 05 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 23 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BROWNSHILL GREEN FARM
COUNDON WEDGE DRIVE
ALLESLEY
COVENTRY
CV5 9DQ
Phone:
02476336616
Website:

rspca-coventryanddistrict.org.uk