STANLEY AND BROCKLEHURST ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An almshouse charity operating exclusively within the town of Macclesfield, Cheshire, providing accommodation for poor married couples, widows or spinsters
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 23 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Peter Mannion MCIH | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||
Eric Michael Hunter | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|||
PATRICK RUFANE ST LAURENCE TYRRELL FRSA FCMA | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|||
DOROTHY BENTLEY SMITH | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.01k | £63.28k | £63.47k | £63.79k | £64.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.13k | £23.64k | £22.61k | £51.68k | £119.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26 MARCH 1991
Charitable objects
THE COST OF REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ALMSHOUSES IN THE PARISHES OF ADLINGTON, BOLLINGTON, HENBURY, HURDSFIELD, PRESTBURY AND SUTTON, AND THE AREA OF THE BOROUGH OF MACCLESFIELD AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 31 MARCH 1974 AND SUBJECT TO THESE PAYMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF THE CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Sherwood Road
MACCLESFIELD
SK11 7RR
- Phone:
- 01625616588
- Email:
- fiona@fionawilson.me.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window