THE LADY SCARISBRICK FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Young people in Southport and the Homeless and those struggling financially
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sefton
Governance
- 28 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Atli Jonsson | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Murray | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE ANTHONY SODEN | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND JOHN HENEGHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIA PARKER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/02/2020 | 04/02/2021 | 04/02/2022 | 04/02/2023 | 04/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.08k | £1.44k | £1.56k | £1.50k | £928 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £900 | £2.10k | £2.25k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 February 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 February 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 February 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 February 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 February 2020 | 31 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME ESTABLISHED BY ORDER DATED 5/11/1956, OF CHANCERY DIVISION OF HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE.
Charitable objects
1. IN MAINTAINING AND FURTHERING THE OBJECTS OF A YOUTH CLUB FOR ST. MARIE'S PARISH FOR THE EDUCATIONAL, RELIGIOUS RECREATIONAL SOCIAL AND ATHLETIC BENEFIT OF YOUNGPEOPLE AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH LIVING IN OR NEAR ST. MARIE'S PARISH. 2. SUBSCRIBING OR MAKING DONATIONS TO SOCIETY OF ST. VINCENT DE PAUL OR OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
ST. MARIE'S ROMAN CATHOLIC PARISH, SOUTHPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
135 EASTBOURNE ROAD
SOUTHPORT
PR8 4EB
- Phone:
- 01704531229
- Email:
- mariaparker248@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window